Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Minnesota

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Minnesota
    Case Number:19-60225
    Party Name:Kyle W. Dye and Veronica L. Dye
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W. [MNB Ch 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
    Date Published:May 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W. [MNB Certificate of completion of financial management course]
    Date Published:May 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W. [MNB Notice of debtor's prior filings]
    Date Published:April 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W. [BNC Certificate of mailing - Meeting of creditors]
    Date Published:April 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W. [MNB Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W. [MNB Certificate of service]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 [MNB Certificate of service]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W. [MNB Add creditor to matrix]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 [MNB Add creditor to matrix]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W. [MNB Amended schedules and statements (fee for schedules D and E/F)]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 [MNB Amended schedules and statements (fee for schedules D and E/F)]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W. [none]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 [none]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W. [MNB Signature declaration]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 [MNB Signature declaration]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W. [MNB Notice of responsibilities of chapter 7 debtors and their attorneys]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 [MNB Notice of responsibilities of chapter 7 debtors and their attorneys]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W. [MNB Income records of Debtor (payment advices)]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 [MNB Income records of Debtor (payment advices)]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W. [MNB Disclosure of compensation of attorney for debtor]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W. [MNB Certificate of credit counseling]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 [MNB Disclosure of compensation of attorney for debtor]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 [MNB Certificate of credit counseling]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W. [MNB Voluntary chapter 7 petition (fee)]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 [MNB Voluntary chapter 7 petition (fee)]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.mnb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?457677
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 2 =