open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Minnesota

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Minnesota
    Case Number:19-31213
    Party Name:Linda Kay Zabel
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dietz, Michael S. [MNB AutoClose Bankruptcy Case]
    Date Published:August 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dietz, Michael S. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:July 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dietz, Michael S. [MNB Discharge of debtor (Auto)]
    Date Published:July 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dietz, Michael S. [MNB Certificate of completion of financial management course]
    Date Published:June 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dietz, Michael S. [MNB Ch 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
    Date Published:May 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dietz, Michael S. [MNB Meeting of creditors concluded - chapter 7 case]
    Date Published:May 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dietz, Michael S. [BNC Certificate of mailing - Meeting of creditors]
    Date Published:April 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dietz, Michael S. [MNB Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dietz, Michael S. [MNB Add creditor to matrix]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [MNB Add creditor to matrix]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dietz, Michael S. [MNB Income records of Debtor (payment advices)]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dietz, Michael S. [MNB Notice of responsibilities of chapter 7 debtors and their attorneys]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [MNB Income records of Debtor (payment advices)]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [MNB Notice of responsibilities of chapter 7 debtors and their attorneys]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dietz, Michael S. [MNB Certificate of credit counseling]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dietz, Michael S. [MNB Signature declaration]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [MNB Certificate of credit counseling]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [MNB Signature declaration]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dietz, Michael S. [none]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [none]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dietz, Michael S. [MNB Voluntary chapter 7 petition (fee)]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [MNB Voluntary chapter 7 petition (fee)]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.mnb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?457675
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 3 =