open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Minnesota

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Minnesota
    Case Number:19-31229
    Party Name:Kevin Mark Murphy
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jensen-Carter, Mary Jo A [MNB AutoClose Bankruptcy Case]
    Date Published:August 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jensen-Carter, Mary Jo A [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:July 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jensen-Carter, Mary Jo A [MNB Discharge of debtor - Chapter 7]
    Date Published:July 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jensen-Carter, Mary Jo A [MNB Reaffirmation agreement]
    Date Published:May 31, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jensen-Carter, Mary Jo A [MNB Ch 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
    Date Published:May 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jensen-Carter, Mary Jo A [MNB Notice of appearance and request for notice]
    Date Published:April 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jensen-Carter, Mary Jo A [MNB Certificate of completion of financial management course]
    Date Published:April 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jensen-Carter, Mary Jo A [BNC Certificate of mailing - Meeting of creditors]
    Date Published:April 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jensen-Carter, Mary Jo A [MNB Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
    Date Published:April 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [none]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [MNB Add creditor to matrix]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [MNB Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition (fee) - case upload]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [MNB Certificate of credit counseling (Case Upload)]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [MNB Signature declaration (Case Upload)]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [MNB Notice of responsibilities of chapter 7 debtors and their attorneys (Case Upload)]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [MNB Income records of Debtor (payment advices) (Case Upload)]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.mnb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?457708
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 1 =