open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Minnesota

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Minnesota
    Case Number:19-31228
    Party Name:MELISSA ANN BRANDT
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jensen-Carter, Mary Jo A [MNB Discharge of debtor - Chapter 7]
    Date Published:July 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jensen-Carter, Mary Jo A [MNB Certificate of completion of financial management course]
    Date Published:July 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jensen-Carter, Mary Jo A [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:July 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jensen-Carter, Mary Jo A [MNB Notice to debtor(s) re: financial management certification]
    Date Published:July 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jensen-Carter, Mary Jo A [MNB Minutes re hrg,fnlhrg,evhrg set by motion, aplc or order]
    Date Published:June 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jensen-Carter, Mary Jo A [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
    Date Published:June 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jensen-Carter, Mary Jo A [MNB Amended motion - motion]
    Date Published:June 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jensen-Carter, Mary Jo A [MNB Certificate of service]
    Date Published:May 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jensen-Carter, Mary Jo A [MNB Affidavit (Individual, not service)]
    Date Published:May 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jensen-Carter, Mary Jo A [MNB Ch 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
    Date Published:May 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jensen-Carter, Mary Jo A [none]
    Date Published:May 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jensen-Carter, Mary Jo A [MNB Notice of no objection]
    Date Published:May 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jensen-Carter, Mary Jo A [MNB Amended motion]
    Date Published:May 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jensen-Carter, Mary Jo A [MNB Motion for relief from stay (fee)]
    Date Published:May 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jensen-Carter, Mary Jo A [MNB Notice of appearance and request for notice]
    Date Published:May 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jensen-Carter, Mary Jo A [BNC Certificate of mailing - Meeting of creditors]
    Date Published:April 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jensen-Carter, Mary Jo A [MNB Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
    Date Published:April 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [MNB Add creditor to matrix]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [MNB Income records of Debtor (payment advices)]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [MNB Notice of responsibilities of chapter 7 debtors and their attorneys]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [none]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [MNB Voluntary chapter 7 petition (fee)]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [MNB Certificate of credit counseling]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [MNB Signature declaration]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.mnb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?457707
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 3 =