open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Minnesota

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Minnesota
    Case Number:19-50325
    Party Name:LYNN M WEBER
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:July 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle [MNB Notice to debtor(s) re: financial management certification]
    Date Published:July 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle [MNB Order confirming chapter 13 plan (fees)]
    Date Published:June 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle [MNB CHAP Minutes re hrg,fnlhrg,evhrg set by motion, aplc or order]
    Date Published:June 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle [MNB Modified chapter 13 plan (Preconfirmation)]
    Date Published:June 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle [MNB Application for compensation preconfirmation Ch 13]
    Date Published:May 31, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle [MNB Certificate of service]
    Date Published:April 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle [MNB Notice of debtor's prior filings]
    Date Published:April 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle [BNC Certificate of mailing - Meeting of creditors]
    Date Published:April 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Ch 13 Plan]
    Date Published:April 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle [MNB Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle [MNB Add creditor to matrix]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 [MNB Add creditor to matrix]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle [none]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 [none]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle [MNB Chapter 13 plan]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 [MNB Chapter 13 plan]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle [MNB Income records of Debtor (payment advices)]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle [MNB Notice of responsibilities of chapter 13 debtors and their attorneys]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 [MNB Income records of Debtor (payment advices)]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 [MNB Notice of responsibilities of chapter 13 debtors and their attorneys]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle [MNB Certificate of credit counseling]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 [MNB Certificate of credit counseling]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle [MNB Voluntary chapter 13 petition (fee)]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 [MNB Voluntary chapter 13 petition (fee)]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.mnb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?457704
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 1 =