open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Minnesota

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Minnesota
    Case Number:19-31222
    Party Name:Cara Elizabeth Gilbert
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jensen-Carter, Mary Jo A [MNB AutoClose Bankruptcy Case]
    Date Published:August 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jensen-Carter, Mary Jo A [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:July 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jensen-Carter, Mary Jo A [MNB Discharge of debtor (Auto)]
    Date Published:July 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jensen-Carter, Mary Jo A [MNB Request for notice by creditor]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jensen-Carter, Mary Jo A [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
    Date Published:July 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jensen-Carter, Mary Jo A [MNB PDF with attached Audio file of hearing]
    Date Published:July 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jensen-Carter, Mary Jo A [MNB Redeem property of the estate - motion]
    Date Published:July 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jensen-Carter, Mary Jo A [MNB CHAP Minutes re hrg,fnlhrg,evhrg set by motion, aplc or order]
    Date Published:July 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jensen-Carter, Mary Jo A [MNB Withdrawal of notice of appearance]
    Date Published:June 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jensen-Carter, Mary Jo A [MNB Motion to redeem property of the estate]
    Date Published:June 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jensen-Carter, Mary Jo A [MNB Ch 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
    Date Published:June 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jensen-Carter, Mary Jo A [MNB Amended schedules and statements (fee for schedules D and E/F)]
    Date Published:June 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jensen-Carter, Mary Jo A [MNB Meeting of creditors concluded- Initial Report on trustee menu]
    Date Published:May 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jensen-Carter, Mary Jo A [MNB Certificate of completion of financial management course]
    Date Published:May 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jensen-Carter, Mary Jo A [MNB Notice of appearance and request for notice]
    Date Published:May 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jensen-Carter, Mary Jo A [BNC Certificate of mailing - Meeting of creditors]
    Date Published:April 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jensen-Carter, Mary Jo A [MNB Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jensen-Carter, Mary Jo A [MNB Add creditor to matrix]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [MNB Add creditor to matrix]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jensen-Carter, Mary Jo A [none]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [none]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jensen-Carter, Mary Jo A [MNB Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition (fee) - case upload]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jensen-Carter, Mary Jo A [MNB Certificate of credit counseling (Case Upload)]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jensen-Carter, Mary Jo A [MNB Signature declaration (Case Upload)]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jensen-Carter, Mary Jo A [MNB Notice of responsibilities of chapter 7 debtors and their attorneys (Case Upload)]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jensen-Carter, Mary Jo A [MNB Income records of Debtor (payment advices) (Case Upload)]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [MNB Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition (fee) - case upload]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [MNB Certificate of credit counseling (Case Upload)]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [MNB Signature declaration (Case Upload)]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [MNB Notice of responsibilities of chapter 7 debtors and their attorneys (Case Upload)]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [MNB Income records of Debtor (payment advices) (Case Upload)]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.mnb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?457694
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 1 =