open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Minnesota

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Minnesota
    Case Number:19-50324
    Party Name:Deborah K Dunn
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik [MNB Discharge of debtor - Chapter 7]
    Date Published:August 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik [MNB Certificate of completion of financial management course]
    Date Published:July 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik [MNB Disclosure of attorney compensation for special appearance at 341 meeting]
    Date Published:June 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik [MNB Meeting of creditors concluded - chapter 7 case]
    Date Published:June 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik [MNB Ch 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
    Date Published:June 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:June 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik [MNB Order deferring discharge]
    Date Published:June 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik [MNB Notice of non-concluded meeting of creditors - chapter 7 case]
    Date Published:June 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik [MNB Notice of rescheduled meeting of creditors]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik [MNB Notice of debtor's prior filings]
    Date Published:April 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik [BNC Certificate of mailing - Meeting of creditors]
    Date Published:April 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik [MNB Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik [none]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik [MNB Income records of Debtor (payment advices)]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik [MNB Notice of responsibilities of chapter 7 debtors and their attorneys]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik [MNB Add creditor to matrix]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik [MNB Voluntary chapter 7 petition (fee)]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik [MNB Certificate of credit counseling]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik [MNB Signature declaration]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.mnb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?457689
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 3 =