open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Minnesota

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Minnesota
    Case Number:19-41154
    Party Name:James M. Van Asten
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burrell, Gregory A [MNB Notice to debtor(s) re: financial management certification]
    Date Published:July 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burrell, Gregory A [MNB Motion to confirm modified plan (chapter 13 postconfirmation only)]
    Date Published:July 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burrell, Gregory A [MNB Modified chapter 13 plan (Postconfirmation)]
    Date Published:July 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burrell, Gregory A [MNB Notice of appearance and request for notice]
    Date Published:July 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burrell, Gregory A [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
    Date Published:June 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burrell, Gregory A [MNB Order granting compensation - Ch 13 (Post and Pre)]
    Date Published:June 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burrell, Gregory A [MNB Application for compensation preconfirmation Ch 13]
    Date Published:June 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burrell, Gregory A [MNB Minutes re: Ch 13]
    Date Published:June 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burrell, Gregory A [MNB Order confirming chapter 13 plan (no fees)]
    Date Published:June 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burrell, Gregory A [MNB Add creditor to matrix]
    Date Published:June 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burrell, Gregory A [MNB Request for notice by creditor]
    Date Published:June 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burrell, Gregory A [MNB Amended schedules and statements (fee for schedules D and E/F)]
    Date Published:June 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burrell, Gregory A [MNB Meeting held - Ch 13 Trustee menu]
    Date Published:June 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burrell, Gregory A [BNC Certificate of mailing - Meeting of creditors]
    Date Published:May 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burrell, Gregory A [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:May 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burrell, Gregory A [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Ch 13 Plan]
    Date Published:May 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burrell, Gregory A [MNB Order re scheduling of confirmation hearing]
    Date Published:May 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burrell, Gregory A [MNB Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
    Date Published:May 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burrell, Gregory A [MNB Chapter 13 plan]
    Date Published:May 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burrell, Gregory A [MNB Signature declaration]
    Date Published:May 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burrell, Gregory A [MNB Chapter 13 completion]
    Date Published:May 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:April 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 [MNB Order on partial case filing]
    Date Published:April 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 [MNB Add creditor to matrix]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 [MNB Signature declaration]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 [MNB Notice of responsibilities of chapter 13 debtors and their attorneys]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 [MNB Income records of Debtor (payment advices)]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 [MNB Certificate of credit counseling]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 [none]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 [MNB Voluntary chapter 13 petition (fee)]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.mnb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?457686
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 3 =