open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Minnesota

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Minnesota
    Case Number:19-31288
    Party Name:Shelly Ann Cole Kolstad
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hedback, John A. [MNB Minutes re hrg,fnlhrg,evhrg set by motion, aplc or order]
    Date Published:August 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hedback, John A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
    Date Published:August 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hedback, John A. [MNB Extend or shorten time - motion]
    Date Published:August 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hedback, John A. [MNB Motion to extend or shorten time]
    Date Published:July 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hedback, John A. [MNB Reaffirmation agreement]
    Date Published:June 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: No, Trustee Assigned [MNB Close bankruptcy case]
    Date Published:May 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hedback, John A. [MNB Ch 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
    Date Published:May 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hedback, John A. [MNB Certificate of completion of financial management course]
    Date Published:April 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hedback, John A. [BNC Certificate of mailing - Meeting of creditors]
    Date Published:April 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hedback, John A. [MNB Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
    Date Published:April 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hedback, John A. [none]
    Date Published:April 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hedback, John A. [MNB Notice of debtor's prior filings]
    Date Published:April 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:April 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [MNB Order dismissing case]
    Date Published:April 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [MNB Notice of debtor's prior filings]
    Date Published:April 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [MNB Add creditor to matrix]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [none]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [MNB Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition (fee) - case upload]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [MNB Certificate of credit counseling (Case Upload)]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [MNB Signature declaration (Case Upload)]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [MNB Notice of responsibilities of chapter 7 debtors and their attorneys (Case Upload)]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [MNB Income records of Debtor (payment advices) (Case Upload)]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.mnb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?457717
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 1 =