open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Minnesota

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Minnesota
    Case Number:19-31230
    Party Name:Joseph Dale Watkins
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burrell, Gregory A [MNB Notice of continued hearing]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burrell, Gregory A [MNB Order confirming chapter 13 plan (fees)]
    Date Published:July 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burrell, Gregory A [MNB Report of chapter 13 trustee re motion for relief from stay]
    Date Published:July 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burrell, Gregory A [MNB Motion for relief from stay (fee)]
    Date Published:July 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burrell, Gregory A [MNB Application for compensation preconfirmation Ch 13]
    Date Published:July 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burrell, Gregory A [MNB Modified chapter 13 plan (Preconfirmation)]
    Date Published:July 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burrell, Gregory A [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:July 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burrell, Gregory A [MNB Notice to debtor(s) re: financial management certification]
    Date Published:July 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burrell, Gregory A [MNB Minutes re: Ch 13]
    Date Published:June 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burrell, Gregory A [MNB Notice of post petition mortgage fees, expenses, and charges]
    Date Published:June 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burrell, Gregory A [MNB Withdrawal of claim]
    Date Published:June 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burrell, Gregory A [MNB Meeting held - Ch 13 Trustee menu]
    Date Published:May 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burrell, Gregory A [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Ch 13 Plan]
    Date Published:April 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burrell, Gregory A [MNB Request for notice by creditor]
    Date Published:April 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burrell, Gregory A [MNB Add creditor to matrix]
    Date Published:April 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burrell, Gregory A [BNC Certificate of mailing - Meeting of creditors]
    Date Published:April 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burrell, Gregory A [none]
    Date Published:April 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burrell, Gregory A [MNB Notice of appearance and request for notice]
    Date Published:April 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burrell, Gregory A [MNB Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
    Date Published:April 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [MNB Add creditor to matrix]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [MNB Notice of responsibilities of chapter 13 debtors and their attorneys]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [MNB Signature declaration]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [MNB Income records of Debtor (payment advices)]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [MNB Certificate of credit counseling]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [MNB Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition (fee) - case upload]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [MNB Chapter 13 plan - case upload]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.mnb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?457713
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 1 =