open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Minnesota

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Minnesota
    Case Number:19-41165
    Party Name:Jamie Adam Clark and Tracy Ann Clark
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burrell, Gregory A [MNB Notice of mortgage payment change]
    Date Published:July 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burrell, Gregory A [MNB Notice to debtor(s) re: financial management certification]
    Date Published:July 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burrell, Gregory A [MNB Order granting compensation - Ch 13 (Post and Pre)]
    Date Published:June 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burrell, Gregory A [MNB Application for compensation postconfirmation Ch 13]
    Date Published:June 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burrell, Gregory A [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:June 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burrell, Gregory A [MNB Minutes re: Ch 13]
    Date Published:June 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burrell, Gregory A [MNB Order confirming chapter 13 plan (no fees)]
    Date Published:June 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burrell, Gregory A [MNB Amended schedules and statements (fee for schedules D and E/F)]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burrell, Gregory A [MNB Meeting held - Ch 13 Trustee menu]
    Date Published:May 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burrell, Gregory A [BNC Certificate of mailing - Meeting of creditors]
    Date Published:April 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burrell, Gregory A [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Ch 13 Plan]
    Date Published:April 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burrell, Gregory A [MNB Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
    Date Published:April 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 [none]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 [MNB Add creditor to matrix]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 [MNB Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition (fee) - case upload]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 [MNB Chapter 13 plan - case upload]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 [MNB Certificate of credit counseling (Case Upload)]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 [MNB Signature declaration (Case Upload)]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 [MNB Notice of responsibilities of chapter 13 debtors and their attorneys (Case Upload)]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 [MNB Income records of Debtor (payment advices) (Case Upload)]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.mnb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?457712
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 1 =