open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Minnesota

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Minnesota
    Case Number:19-60353
    Party Name:Tara J. McCann
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [MNB Motion objecting to discharge]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [MNB Notice to debtor(s) re: financial management certification]
    Date Published:September 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [MNB Dismiss case - motion]
    Date Published:August 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [MNB PDF with attached Audio file of hearing]
    Date Published:August 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [MNB CHAP Minutes re hrg set by motion, aplc or order]
    Date Published:August 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [MNB Affidavit (Individual, not service)]
    Date Published:August 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [MNB Notice re: submission of scanned documents]
    Date Published:August 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:August 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [MNB Order deferring discharge]
    Date Published:July 31, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [MNB Notice of non-concluded meeting of creditors - chapter 7 case]
    Date Published:July 31, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [MNB Motion to dismiss case]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [MNB Withdrawal]
    Date Published:July 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [BNC Certificate of mailing - Meeting of creditors]
    Date Published:June 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [MNB Notice of debtor's prior filings]
    Date Published:June 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [MNB Notice of debtor's ineligibility for discharge]
    Date Published:June 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [MNB Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [MNB Add creditor to matrix]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [MNB Income records of Debtor (payment advices)]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [MNB Signature declaration]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [MNB Certificate of credit counseling]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 [MNB Certificate of credit counseling]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [none]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 [MNB Add creditor to matrix]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 [none]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [MNB Voluntary chapter 7 petition (fee)]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [MNB Notice of responsibilities of chapter 7 debtors and their attorneys]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 [MNB Voluntary chapter 7 petition (fee)]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 [MNB Notice of responsibilities of chapter 7 debtors and their attorneys]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.mnb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?459374
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 2 =