open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Minnesota

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Minnesota
    Case Number:19-60418
    Party Name:Rodger Ole Luckow and Beverly Ann Luckow
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [MNB Meeting of creditors rescheduled by trustee]
    Date Published:October 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [MNB Notice re: submission of scanned documents]
    Date Published:August 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [MNB Amended schedules and statements (fee for schedules D and E/F)]
    Date Published:August 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [MNB Certificate of completion of financial management course]
    Date Published:August 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [MNB Rescheduled meeting of creditors - Trustee 341 Filing only]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [MNB Notice of rescheduled meeting of creditors]
    Date Published:August 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [BNC Certificate of mailing - Meeting of creditors]
    Date Published:July 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [MNB Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
    Date Published:July 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [MNB Notice of responsibilities of chapter 7 debtors and their attorneys]
    Date Published:July 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [MNB Signature declaration]
    Date Published:July 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [MNB Income records of Debtor (payment advices)]
    Date Published:July 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [MNB Certificate of credit counseling]
    Date Published:July 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 [MNB Certificate of credit counseling]
    Date Published:July 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [MNB Add creditor to matrix]
    Date Published:July 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [none]
    Date Published:July 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 [MNB Add creditor to matrix]
    Date Published:July 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 [none]
    Date Published:July 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [MNB Voluntary chapter 7 petition (fee)]
    Date Published:July 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 [MNB Voluntary chapter 7 petition (fee)]
    Date Published:July 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.mnb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?460140
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 3 =