open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Minnesota

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Minnesota
    Case Number:19-32223
    Party Name:Amanda Inez Garcia
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burrell, Gregory A [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:October 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burrell, Gregory A [MNB Hearing continued other]
    Date Published:October 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burrell, Gregory A [MNB Notice to debtor(s) re: financial management certification]
    Date Published:September 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burrell, Gregory A [MNB Withdrawal]
    Date Published:September 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burrell, Gregory A [MNB Modified chapter 13 plan (Preconfirmation)]
    Date Published:September 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burrell, Gregory A [MNB Meeting held - Ch 13 Trustee menu]
    Date Published:August 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burrell, Gregory A [MNB Objection to confirmation of ch 13 plan]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burrell, Gregory A [MNB Notice of change of address]
    Date Published:July 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burrell, Gregory A [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Ch 13 Plan]
    Date Published:July 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burrell, Gregory A [MNB Request for notice by creditor]
    Date Published:July 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burrell, Gregory A [BNC Certificate of mailing - Meeting of creditors]
    Date Published:July 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burrell, Gregory A [MNB Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burrell, Gregory A [MNB Add creditor to matrix]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [MNB Add creditor to matrix]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burrell, Gregory A [MNB Notice of responsibilities of chapter 13 debtors and their attorneys]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burrell, Gregory A [MNB Signature declaration]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [MNB Notice of responsibilities of chapter 13 debtors and their attorneys]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [MNB Signature declaration]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burrell, Gregory A [none]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burrell, Gregory A [MNB Income records of Debtor (payment advices)]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [none]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [MNB Income records of Debtor (payment advices)]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burrell, Gregory A [MNB Chapter 13 plan]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burrell, Gregory A [MNB Certificate of credit counseling]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [MNB Chapter 13 plan]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [MNB Certificate of credit counseling]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burrell, Gregory A [MNB Voluntary chapter 13 petition (fee)]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [MNB Voluntary chapter 13 petition (fee)]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.mnb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?460175
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 1 =