open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Minnesota

MINNESOTA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Minnesota
    Case Number:19-42445
    Party Name:Shiloh Marie Mitch
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle [MNB Close bankruptcy case]
    Date Published:October 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle [MNB Final report and account of Chapter 13 trustee]
    Date Published:September 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle [MNB Order dismissing case for failure to file required documents under 521(i)]
    Date Published:August 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:August 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle [MNB Order on partial case filing]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 [MNB Signature declaration]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 [none]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 [MNB Certificate of credit counseling]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 [MNB Notice of responsibilities of chapter 13 debtors and their attorneys]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 [MNB Add creditor to matrix]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 [MNB Voluntary chapter 13 petition (fee)]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.mnb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?461048
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 2 =