Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi
    Case Number:3:17-cv-00022
    Party Name:Pendergist v. Miller et al
    Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Remand]
    Date Published:February 06, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi
    Case Number:3:17-cv-00022
    Party Name:Pendergist v. Miller et al
    Filing Type:Civil [Remand]
    Date Published:February 01, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi
    Case Number:3:17-cv-00022
    Party Name:Pendergist v. Miller et al
    Filing Type:Civil [Order Cancelling Deadline]
    Date Published:February 01, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi
    Case Number:3:17-cv-00022
    Party Name:Pendergist v. Miller et al
    Filing Type:Civil [State Court Record]
    Date Published:January 24, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi
    Case Number:3:17-cv-00022
    Party Name:Pendergist v. Miller et al
    Filing Type:Civil [Docket Annotation]
    Date Published:January 18, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi
    Case Number:3:17-cv-00022
    Party Name:Pendergist v. Miller et al
    Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:January 18, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi
    Case Number:3:17-cv-00022
    Party Name:Pendergist v. Miller et al
    Filing Type:Civil [Rule 16(a) Initial Order]
    Date Published:January 12, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi
    Case Number:3:17-cv-00022
    Party Name:Pendergist v. Miller et al
    Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Removal]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Source: https://ecf.mssd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?94458

Post Your Comment or Question

8 x 1 =