Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Mississippi

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Mississippi
    Case Number:19-11111-
    Party Name:Curnal Page
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Fava, William L. [Submit Proposed Order]
    Date Published:April 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Fava, William L. [Notice of Motion or Application]
    Date Published:March 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Fava, William L. [Clerk's Request for Corrective Action (2)]
    Date Published:March 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Fava, William L. [Avoid Judicial Lien]
    Date Published:March 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Fava, William L. [BNC Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:March 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Fava, William L. [AutoAssign Judge - Ch 7 Trustee - Ind NoAsset]
    Date Published:March 15, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.msnb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?174175
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 3 =