Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Mississippi

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Mississippi
    Case Number:19-11110-
    Party Name:Michael S. Brasher
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Fava, William L. [Abandon]
    Date Published:April 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Fava, William L. [Relief from Stay]
    Date Published:April 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Fava, William L. [Hearing Held]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Fava, William L. [Response]
    Date Published:March 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Fava, William L. [Hearing Set (Document)]
    Date Published:March 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Fava, William L. [Abandon (No Fee)]
    Date Published:March 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Fava, William L. [Relief from Stay (Fee)]
    Date Published:March 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Fava, William L. [BNC Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:March 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Fava, William L. [AutoAssign Judge - Ch 7 Trustee - Ind NoAsset]
    Date Published:March 15, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.msnb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?174174
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 1 =