Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi
    Case Number:5:19-cv-00022
    Party Name:Estate of Joseph Laverne Sturdivant et al v. Victor Smith
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:May 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
    Date Published:May 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Judgment on the Pleadings]
    Date Published:May 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:May 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Returned Executed]
    Date Published:May 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order of Recusal]
    Date Published:March 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:March 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:March 15, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.mssd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?102926
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 2 =