open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi
    Case Number:1:19-cv-00320
    Party Name:Ramsey v. Cottle et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Rule 16(a) Initial Order]
    Date Published:September 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Amended Complaint]
    Date Published:August 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Docket Annotation]
    Date Published:August 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Returned Executed]
    Date Published:July 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response to Order]
    Date Published:July 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amended Complaint]
    Date Published:July 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:June 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.mssd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?104016
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 2 =