open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi
    Case Number:1:19-cv-00318
    Party Name:Elly v. Mavar Properties LLC et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
    Date Published:July 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Answer]
    Date Published:July 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Returned Executed]
    Date Published:July 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Docket Annotation]
    Date Published:June 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:June 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Remark]
    Date Published:June 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order of Recusal]
    Date Published:June 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.mssd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?104015
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 1 =