open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi
    Case Number:3:19-cv-00408
    Party Name:Cook v. Creed et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Service of Request for Production]
    Date Published:September 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Service of Interrogatories]
    Date Published:September 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Service of Request for Admissions]
    Date Published:September 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Management Order]
    Date Published:August 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Telephonic Case Management Conference]
    Date Published:August 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Docket Annotation]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Service of Disclosure]
    Date Published:August 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:July 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Rule 16(a) Initial Order]
    Date Published:June 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [State Court Record]
    Date Published:June 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Joinder in Document]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Removal]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.mssd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?104022
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 3 =