open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi
    Case Number:3:19-cv-00405
    Party Name:Roberts v. Jone et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Judgment]
    Date Published:August 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Dismissing Case]
    Date Published:August 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order to Show Cause]
    Date Published:August 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Letter]
    Date Published:June 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Opsp8]
    Date Published:June 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Opsp2]
    Date Published:June 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proceed IFP 1983]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.mssd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?104018
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 2 =