open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi
    Case Number:1:19-cv-00377
    Party Name:Bates v. BP Exploration & Production, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
    Date Published:July 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
    Date Published:July 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Withdraw as Attorney]
    Date Published:July 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Intent to Serve Subpoena]
    Date Published:July 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:July 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Pro Hac Vice Request Letter]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Transferred In - District Transfer]
    Date Published:July 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:July 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.mssd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?104386
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 2 =