Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Missouri

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Missouri
    Case Number:4:19-cv-00449
    Party Name:Culbertson v. Monsanto Company
  • Filing Type:Civil [Remark]
    Date Published:April 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order of MDL Transfer]
    Date Published:April 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Conditional Transfer Order (does not the close the case)]
    Date Published:April 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Waiver of Service Executed]
    Date Published:March 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Opening Notification]
    Date Published:March 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:March 14, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.moed.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?169292
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 3 =