open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of Missouri

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of Missouri
    Case Number:1:19-cr-00113-1
    Party Name:USA v. Mount
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Sealed Motion]
    Date Published:September 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sealed Motion (no service occurs via CM/ECF)]
    Date Published:September 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Clerk's Order of Reassignment (District Judge or Magistrate)]
    Date Published:August 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Regarding Pretrial Motion Status]
    Date Published:August 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Waiver of Filing Pretrial Motions]
    Date Published:August 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Vacate]
    Date Published:July 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Vacate]
    Date Published:July 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Warrant Returned Executed]
    Date Published:July 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Response to Discovery]
    Date Published:June 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Response to Order Concerning Pretrial Motions]
    Date Published:June 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [CJA Form 23 - Financial Affidavit]
    Date Published:June 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Entry of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
    Date Published:June 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Request for Discovery]
    Date Published:June 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Detain]
    Date Published:June 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Concerning Pretrial Motions]
    Date Published:June 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Oral (For Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions by Defendant)]
    Date Published:June 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Appointing Public Defender]
    Date Published:June 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Initial Appearance]
    Date Published:June 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arraignment]
    Date Published:June 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Detention Hearing]
    Date Published:June 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arrest]
    Date Published:June 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
    Date Published:June 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum (Order)]
    Date Published:June 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Case Assignment Local Rule 2.08]
    Date Published:June 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Warrant Issued]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Detention and Hearing]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Indictment - Redacted]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Indictment]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.moed.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?172245
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 1 =