open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Missouri

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Missouri
    Case Number:2:19-cv-00053
    Party Name:Scott v. Saul
  • Filing Type:Civil [Transcript of certified administrative hearing]
    Date Published:September 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:September 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [A Docket Text Order with Schedules]
    Date Published:September 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Answer]
    Date Published:September 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Entry of Appearance]
    Date Published:July 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued as to USA]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Management Order]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Opening Notification]
    Date Published:July 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Financial Affidavit - CJA 23]
    Date Published:July 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:July 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint (Social Security)]
    Date Published:July 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.moed.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?172959
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 3 =