open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of Missouri

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of Missouri
    Case Number:1:19-cr-00126-1
    Party Name:USA v. Travon Dewayne Mhoon
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Plea Agreement, Guidelines Rec & Stip Supplement]
    Date Published:October 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Plea Agreement, Guidelines Rec & Stip]
    Date Published:October 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Change of Plea Hearing]
    Date Published:October 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Continue]
    Date Published:August 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order (rule motion and set or satisfy schedule)]
    Date Published:August 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:August 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Regarding Pretrial Motion Status]
    Date Published:August 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Waiver of Filing Pretrial Motions]
    Date Published:August 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Warrant Returned Executed]
    Date Published:July 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Response to Discovery]
    Date Published:July 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Entry of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Response to Order Concerning Pretrial Motions]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Request for Discovery]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Remark]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Concerning Pretrial Motions]
    Date Published:July 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Oral (For Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions by Defendant)]
    Date Published:July 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [CJA Form 23 - Financial Affidavit]
    Date Published:July 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Initial Appearance]
    Date Published:July 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Detention Hearing]
    Date Published:July 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arraignment]
    Date Published:July 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Detain]
    Date Published:July 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Appointing Public Defender]
    Date Published:July 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arrest]
    Date Published:July 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.moed.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?172924
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 2 =