open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of Missouri

MISSOURI PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of Missouri
    Case Number:4:19-cr-00633-1
    Party Name:USA v. Shurtz
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sealed Document (no service occurs via CM/ECF)]
    Date Published:October 31, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
    Date Published:September 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Extension of Time to File Document]
    Date Published:September 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Concerning Pretrial Motions]
    Date Published:August 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Extension]
    Date Published:August 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arraignment]
    Date Published:August 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Discovery Letter]
    Date Published:August 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Request for Discovery]
    Date Published:August 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Entry of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
    Date Published:August 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Warrant Returned Executed]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Bond]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Appointing Public Defender]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Rule 5 Papers]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Bond Hearing]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Initial Appearance]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arrest]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.moed.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?173911
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 3 =