open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Nebraska

NEBRASKA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Nebraska
    Case Number:4:20-cr-03031-1
    Party Name:USA v. Thomas
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Memorandum and Order]
    Date Published:September 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Review]
    Date Published:September 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:June 30, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:June 30, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Information - Felony]
    Date Published:June 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:June 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Report/Order Terminating Probation]
    Date Published:June 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset All Hearings]
    Date Published:April 01, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Petition for Offender Under Supervision (Prob 12C)]
    Date Published:March 30, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Restricted Order Pursuant to E-Government Act]
    Date Published:March 26, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
    Date Published:March 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
    Date Published:January 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Writ Issued]
    Date Published:November 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
    Date Published:November 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Prosequendum]
    Date Published:November 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Consent/Order regarding Conditions of Release (Prob 12B)]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Reassignment Order]
    Date Published:July 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Order on Motion to Dismiss Criminal Case]
    Date Published:May 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Dismiss Criminal Case]
    Date Published:May 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Preliminary Hearing]
    Date Published:May 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Notice of Unsealing]
    Date Published:May 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Retroactive Sentencing Worksheet - RESTRICTED]
    Date Published:February 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order - GO 2019-01]
    Date Published:January 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Strike Order]
    Date Published:August 20, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Letter]
    Date Published:June 25, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
    Date Published:March 23, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Hearing]
    Date Published:March 12, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
    Date Published:March 08, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Mandate/Judgment]
    Date Published:February 22, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Opinion of USCA]
    Date Published:December 21, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Extend]
    Date Published:September 15, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Extend]
    Date Published:September 14, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
    Date Published:September 06, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Withdraw as Attorney]
    Date Published:September 01, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Receipt (Other)]
    Date Published:August 22, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Petition regarding Conditions of Pretrial Release]
    Date Published:August 11, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Initial Appearance - Pretrial Violation]
    Date Published:August 09, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Petition regarding Conditions of Pretrial Release - SEALED]
    Date Published:August 07, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Waiver]
    Date Published:July 18, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Status Conference]
    Date Published:June 29, 2017
  • Filing Type:[Complaint]
    Date Published:June 12, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Transcript - Redacted]
    Date Published:April 14, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment Returned Executed]
    Date Published:April 11, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Intent to Request Redaction]
    Date Published:April 06, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255 Johnson)]
    Date Published:April 03, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Designated Clerk's Record]
    Date Published:February 28, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order/Judgment from USCA]
    Date Published:February 08, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Scheduling Letter]
    Date Published:February 08, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notification of Appeal and NOA Supplement]
    Date Published:February 08, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Copy of IFP Memo]
    Date Published:February 07, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Request for Transcript]
    Date Published:February 06, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Appeal to USCA]
    Date Published:February 06, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Rule 5 Pleadings - In]
    Date Published:February 01, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Terminate Criminal Case]
    Date Published:January 25, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment]
    Date Published:January 20, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Right to Appeal]
    Date Published:January 19, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sentencing]
    Date Published:January 19, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Plea and Plea Agreement Accepted]
    Date Published:January 19, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Reassignment Order - Referral Judge (TEXT ONLY)]
    Date Published:January 03, 2017
  • Filing Type:[Notice to Receiving District of Criminal Case Transfer]
    Date Published:November 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:[Commitment to Another District]
    Date Published:November 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:[Waiver of Rule 5 Hearings]
    Date Published:November 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:[Rule 5 Petition - Out]
    Date Published:November 18, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Tentative Findings of Fact]
    Date Published:November 01, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Adoption of/Statement regarding Presentence Report]
    Date Published:October 25, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Jury Instructions]
    Date Published:October 20, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Jury Verdict]
    Date Published:October 20, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Receipt (Exhibit)]
    Date Published:October 20, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Jury Questions/Answers]
    Date Published:October 20, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Exhibit List]
    Date Published:October 19, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Witness List]
    Date Published:October 19, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Jury Trial - Ended]
    Date Published:October 19, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Jury Panel Record]
    Date Published:October 19, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion in Limine]
    Date Published:October 18, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Terminate Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:October 18, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Jury Selection]
    Date Published:October 18, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Jury Trial - Began]
    Date Published:October 18, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
    Date Published:October 17, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Response]
    Date Published:October 14, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Jury Pool Trial Report and SQs]
    Date Published:October 13, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [In Limine]
    Date Published:October 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Proposed Verdict Form]
    Date Published:October 10, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Proposed Jury Instructions]
    Date Published:October 09, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order]
    Date Published:October 05, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Brief]
    Date Published:October 04, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Proposed Witness List]
    Date Published:October 04, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Proposed Exhibit List]
    Date Published:October 04, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
    Date Published:September 20, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Transcript - Unredacted]
    Date Published:September 19, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Letter by Clerk - Transcriber]
    Date Published:August 24, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Plea Agreement]
    Date Published:August 24, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Petition to Enter Plea of Guilty]
    Date Published:August 24, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Findings and Recommendation on Guilty Plea]
    Date Published:August 23, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
    Date Published:August 23, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Sentencing Schedule]
    Date Published:August 23, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Change of Plea Hearing]
    Date Published:August 23, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Detention Hearing Review]
    Date Published:August 23, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Setting Change of Plea Hearing]
    Date Published:August 19, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Report for Offender Under Supervision]
    Date Published:July 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Appoint Counsel]
    Date Published:July 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Trial Order]
    Date Published:July 19, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
    Date Published:June 24, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order of Detention]
    Date Published:June 24, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order for Progression of a Criminal Case]
    Date Published:June 23, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arraignment]
    Date Published:June 23, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Criminal Cover Sheet]
    Date Published:June 23, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Forepersons Signature Page]
    Date Published:June 23, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Indictment]
    Date Published:June 23, 2016
  • Filing Type:[Detention Hearing]
    Date Published:June 15, 2016
  • Filing Type:[Initial Appearance]
    Date Published:June 15, 2016
  • Filing Type:[Oral]
    Date Published:June 15, 2016
  • Filing Type:[Notice of Unsealing Case]
    Date Published:June 13, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Deficiency (No Signature)]
    Date Published:May 31, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Vacate (2255 Johnson)]
    Date Published:May 31, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
    Date Published:May 26, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment - Revocation]
    Date Published:May 26, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Restricted Document Pursuant to E-Government Act]
    Date Published:May 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Restrict pursuant to E-Goverment Act]
    Date Published:May 10, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Restricted Motion pursuant to E-Government Act]
    Date Published:May 10, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Restricted Motion Pursuant to E-Government Act]
    Date Published:May 04, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Restrict Pursuant to E-Government Act (Motion for Permission to Restrict)]
    Date Published:May 04, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order - GO 2015-03]
    Date Published:April 20, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Continue]
    Date Published:April 18, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Continue]
    Date Published:April 15, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Audio File]
    Date Published:March 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Setting Motion Hearing]
    Date Published:March 24, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Appointing Counsel]
    Date Published:March 23, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings (MJs Only)]
    Date Published:March 23, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Warrant Returned Executed]
    Date Published:March 18, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
    Date Published:March 18, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Remark - Public]
    Date Published:September 25, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
    Date Published:August 26, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:August 25, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order - GO 2014-08]
    Date Published:October 02, 2014
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Oral Motion]
    Date Published:May 09, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.ned.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?65340
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 3 =