Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Nebraska

  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Nebraska
    Case Number:17-80028-
    Party Name:Charles Hartwell Betten
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Certificate of Service of RELEASING EMPLOYER (batch)]
    Date Published:March 21, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Nebraska
    Case Number:17-80028-
    Party Name:Charles Hartwell Betten
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:March 15, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Nebraska
    Case Number:17-80028-
    Party Name:Charles Hartwell Betten
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Notice of Requirement for Financial Management Course]
    Date Published:March 13, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Nebraska
    Case Number:17-80028-
    Party Name:Charles Hartwell Betten
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Confirming Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:March 08, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Nebraska
    Case Number:17-80028-
    Party Name:Charles Hartwell Betten
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Meeting of Creditors Held]
    Date Published:February 23, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Nebraska
    Case Number:17-80028-
    Party Name:Charles Hartwell Betten
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Certificate Regarding Confirmation Chapter 12/13]
    Date Published:February 21, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Nebraska
    Case Number:17-80028-
    Party Name:Charles Hartwell Betten
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Acknowledgment of Claim (batch)]
    Date Published:February 02, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Nebraska
    Case Number:17-80028-
    Party Name:Charles Hartwell Betten
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
    Date Published:January 27, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Nebraska
    Case Number:17-80028-
    Party Name:Charles Hartwell Betten
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:January 14, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Nebraska
    Case Number:17-80028-
    Party Name:Charles Hartwell Betten
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Certificate of Service of EMPLOYER TO PAY TRUSTEE (batch)]
    Date Published:January 13, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Nebraska
    Case Number:17-80028-
    Party Name:Charles Hartwell Betten
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:January 12, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Nebraska
    Case Number:17-80028-
    Party Name:Charles Hartwell Betten
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Objection to Confirmation Deadline Updated (ADI)]
    Date Published:January 12, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Nebraska
    Case Number:17-80028-
    Party Name:Charles Hartwell Betten
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Clerks Evidence of Repeat Filing]
    Date Published:January 12, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Nebraska
    Case Number:17-80028-
    Party Name:Charles Hartwell Betten
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 13]
    Date Published:January 12, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Nebraska
    Case Number:17-80028-
    Party Name:Charles Hartwell Betten
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Nebraska
    Case Number:17-80028
    Party Name:Charles Hartwell Betten
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 [Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Nebraska
    Case Number:17-80028-
    Party Name:Charles Hartwell Betten
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Pay Advice]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Nebraska
    Case Number:17-80028
    Party Name:Charles Hartwell Betten
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 [Pay Advice]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Nebraska
    Case Number:17-80028-
    Party Name:Charles Hartwell Betten
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Nebraska
    Case Number:17-80028
    Party Name:Charles Hartwell Betten
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Nebraska
    Case Number:17-80028-
    Party Name:Charles Hartwell Betten
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Nebraska
    Case Number:17-80028
    Party Name:Charles Hartwell Betten
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Nebraska
    Case Number:17-80028-
    Party Name:Charles Hartwell Betten
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Nebraska
    Case Number:17-80028
    Party Name:Charles Hartwell Betten
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Source: https://ecf.neb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?165804

Post Your Comment or Question

8 x 3 =