open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Nebraska

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Nebraska
    Case Number:19-40200-
    Party Name:Shawnna Kay Bonner
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Overcash, James A. [Close Bankruptcy Case 7 13 (Autodocket)]
    Date Published:May 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Overcash, James A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
    Date Published:May 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Overcash, James A. [Discharging Debtor (Autodocket)]
    Date Published:May 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Overcash, James A. [Ch 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution (341 Filings)]
    Date Published:March 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Overcash, James A. [Deficiency Notice]
    Date Published:March 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Overcash, James A. [Corrective Entry-Incorrect PDF]
    Date Published:March 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Overcash, James A. [Withdrawal]
    Date Published:March 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Overcash, James A. [Certificate of Financial Management Course]
    Date Published:March 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Overcash, James A. [Pay Advice]
    Date Published:February 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Overcash, James A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:February 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Overcash, James A. [Creditor Request for Notices (No PDF Required)]
    Date Published:February 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Overcash, James A. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
    Date Published:February 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Overcash, James A. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 7]
    Date Published:February 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Overcash, James A. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:February 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Overcash, James A. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:February 09, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.neb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?174470
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 2 =