Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Nebraska

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Nebraska
    Case Number:19-80212-
    Party Name:Amber Diane Stong
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stalnaker, John [Non-Compliance]
    Date Published:April 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stalnaker, John [Avoid Lien]
    Date Published:April 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stalnaker, John [Amended Schedules/Statements]
    Date Published:March 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stalnaker, John [Ch 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution (341 Filings)]
    Date Published:March 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stalnaker, John [Certificate of Financial Management Course]
    Date Published:March 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stalnaker, John [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:February 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stalnaker, John [Update Deficiency Deadlines]
    Date Published:February 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stalnaker, John [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:February 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stalnaker, John [Creditor Request for Notices (No PDF Required)]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stalnaker, John [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 7]
    Date Published:February 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stalnaker, John [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
    Date Published:February 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
    Date Published:February 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stalnaker, John [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:February 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:February 10, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.neb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?174471
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 3 =