open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Nebraska

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Nebraska
    Case Number:19-41194-
    Party Name:Harold T Clover and Dawn D Clover
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Notice of Amended Plan]
    Date Published:October 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Order Regarding Plan / Amended Plan]
    Date Published:September 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Amended Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:September 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
    Date Published:September 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Certification of ALC Fees]
    Date Published:September 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Borrow]
    Date Published:September 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Borrow/Incur Debt]
    Date Published:August 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Shorten Time]
    Date Published:August 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Meeting of Creditors Held]
    Date Published:August 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Acknowledgment of Claim (batch)]
    Date Published:August 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Response]
    Date Published:August 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Exhibit]
    Date Published:August 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
    Date Published:August 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Personal Financial Mgt Course Certificate]
    Date Published:August 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Certificate of Service of TRUSTEES NOTICE TO CLAIMANT AND DEBTOR (batch)]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Notice of Postpetition Mortgage Fees, Expenses, and Charges]
    Date Published:August 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Certificate of Service of EMPLOYER TO PAY TRUSTEE (batch)]
    Date Published:August 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Certificate Regarding Confirmation Chapter 12/13]
    Date Published:August 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:August 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Pay Advice]
    Date Published:August 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Chapter 13 Statement of Monthly Income 122C-1]
    Date Published:August 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Statement of Financial Affairs]
    Date Published:August 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Schedule Summary of Assets and Liabilities]
    Date Published:August 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Schedule J]
    Date Published:August 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Schedule I]
    Date Published:August 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Schedule H]
    Date Published:August 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Schedule G]
    Date Published:August 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Schedule E/F]
    Date Published:August 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Schedule D]
    Date Published:August 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Schedule C]
    Date Published:August 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Schedule A/B]
    Date Published:August 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
    Date Published:August 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Declaration]
    Date Published:August 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Extend Time]
    Date Published:July 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:July 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
    Date Published:July 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Objection to Confirmation Deadline Updated (ADI)]
    Date Published:July 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Clerks Evidence of Repeat Filing]
    Date Published:July 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Creditor Request for Notices (No PDF Required)]
    Date Published:July 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 13]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.neb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?176321
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 2 =