open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Nebraska

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Nebraska
    Case Number:19-81029-
    Party Name:Penny Rae Culver
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stalnaker, John [Discharging Debtor (Autodocket)]
    Date Published:October 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stalnaker, John [Ch 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution (341 Filings)]
    Date Published:August 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stalnaker, John [Amended Schedules/Statements]
    Date Published:July 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stalnaker, John [Certificate of Financial Management Course]
    Date Published:July 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stalnaker, John [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:July 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stalnaker, John [Schedule Summary of Assets and Liabilities]
    Date Published:July 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stalnaker, John [Clerks Evidence of Repeat Filing]
    Date Published:July 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stalnaker, John [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 7]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stalnaker, John [Deficiency Notice - Summary of Assets & Liabilities]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 [Deficiency Notice - Summary of Assets & Liabilities]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stalnaker, John [Pay Advice]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 [Pay Advice]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stalnaker, John [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stalnaker, John [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stalnaker, John [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.neb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?176319
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 1 =