open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Nebraska

NEBRASKA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Nebraska
    Case Number:19-41398-
    Party Name:Thomas Edward Swartz and Amy Christine Swartz
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kruse, Brian S. [Close Bankruptcy Case 7 13 (Autodocket)]
    Date Published:November 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kruse, Brian S. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
    Date Published:November 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kruse, Brian S. [Discharging Debtor (Autodocket)]
    Date Published:November 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kruse, Brian S. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
    Date Published:October 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kruse, Brian S. [Meeting of Creditors Held]
    Date Published:September 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kruse, Brian S. [Personal Financial Mgt Course Certificate]
    Date Published:August 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kruse, Brian S. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:August 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kruse, Brian S. [Clerks Evidence of Repeat Filing]
    Date Published:August 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kruse, Brian S. [Update Deficiency Deadlines]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kruse, Brian S. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 7]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kruse, Brian S. [Declaration]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kruse, Brian S. [Pay Advice]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kruse, Brian S. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kruse, Brian S. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kruse, Brian S. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.neb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?176700
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 1 =