open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Nebraska

NEBRASKA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Nebraska
    Case Number:20-80191-
    Party Name:Wilson Whaverly Ryals
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Chapter 13 Trustees Notice of Final Report (batch)]
    Date Published:September 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Chapter 13 Trustees Final Report and Account (batch)]
    Date Published:September 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Dismissing Case]
    Date Published:August 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Dismissing Debtor(s)]
    Date Published:August 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Affidavit/Declaration]
    Date Published:August 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Stipulation Regarding NOD]
    Date Published:July 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Motion/Notice to Allow Claims (batch)]
    Date Published:June 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Notice of Payment Default (batch)]
    Date Published:June 22, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Confirming Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:May 15, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Receipt of Final Installment Payment]
    Date Published:May 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Payment through Internet]
    Date Published:May 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Notice of Requirement for Financial Management Course]
    Date Published:April 15, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Entry - No Action On Plan]
    Date Published:April 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Meeting of Creditors Held]
    Date Published:March 30, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Support Document]
    Date Published:March 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Acknowledgment of Claim (batch)]
    Date Published:March 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:February 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Certificate of Service of DEBTOR TO PAY TRUSTEE (batch)]
    Date Published:February 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Objection to Confirmation Deadline Updated (ADI)]
    Date Published:February 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:February 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Creditor Request for Notices (No PDF Required)]
    Date Published:February 15, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 13]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Deficiency Notice]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 [Deficiency Notice]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Pay Filing Fees in Installments]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 [Pay Filing Fees in Installments]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Pay Trustee Directly]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 [Pay Trustee Directly]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Certificate Regarding Confirmation Chapter 12/13]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 [Certificate Regarding Confirmation Chapter 12/13]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 [Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Pay Advice]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 [Pay Advice]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.neb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?178608
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 1 =