Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Nevada

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Nevada
    Case Number:19-10188-abl
    Party Name:DANA SH-NEICE WYNNE
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SCHWARTZER, LENARD E. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds]
    Date Published:February 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SCHWARTZER, LENARD E. [Statement Adjourning Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:February 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SCHWARTZER, LENARD E. [Personal Financial Management Course Certificate]
    Date Published:January 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SCHWARTZER, LENARD E. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - pdf]
    Date Published:January 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SCHWARTZER, LENARD E. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:January 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SCHWARTZER, LENARD E. [Order Re: Debtor's Compliance with 521 (BNC)]
    Date Published:January 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SCHWARTZER, LENARD E. [Request for Special Notice (BK)]
    Date Published:January 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SCHWARTZER, LENARD E. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset Individual (BNC-auto assignment)]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SCHWARTZER, LENARD E. [Auto-docket of online payment]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SCHWARTZER, LENARD E. [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SCHWARTZER, LENARD E. [122A-1 Chapter 7 Statement of Your Monthly Income Form]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SCHWARTZER, LENARD E. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SCHWARTZER, LENARD E. [Voluntary Petition 7]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SCHWARTZER, LENARD E. [Statement of Social Security Number(s) (Must be Docketed Separately)]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.nvb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?378512
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 1 =