open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Nevada

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Nevada
    Case Number:19-10773-btb
    Party Name:NIRANJAN MADHUKAR VICHARE
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SCHWARTZER, LENARD E. [Final Decree and Closing of Chapter 7 Case (AutoClose)]
    Date Published:May 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SCHWARTZER, LENARD E. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
    Date Published:May 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SCHWARTZER, LENARD E. [Discharge of Debtor (BNC)]
    Date Published:May 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SCHWARTZER, LENARD E. [Financial Management Course (Official Form 423)]
    Date Published:March 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SCHWARTZER, LENARD E. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds]
    Date Published:March 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SCHWARTZER, LENARD E. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - pdf]
    Date Published:February 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SCHWARTZER, LENARD E. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:February 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SCHWARTZER, LENARD E. [Order Re: Debtor's Compliance with 521 (BNC)]
    Date Published:February 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SCHWARTZER, LENARD E. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filing (ADI)]
    Date Published:February 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SCHWARTZER, LENARD E. [Request for Special Notice (BK)]
    Date Published:February 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SCHWARTZER, LENARD E. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SCHWARTZER, LENARD E. [Auto-docket of online payment]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SCHWARTZER, LENARD E. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset Individual (BNC-auto assignment)]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SCHWARTZER, LENARD E. [Voluntary Petition 7]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SCHWARTZER, LENARD E. [Statement of Social Security Number(s) (Must be Docketed Separately)]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SCHWARTZER, LENARD E. [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SCHWARTZER, LENARD E. [122A-1 Chapter 7 Statement of Your Monthly Income Form]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.nvb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?379232
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 1 =