open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Nevada

NEVADA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Nevada
    Case Number:2:18-cv-01958
    Party Name:Choate v. Weidick et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Reconsider]
    Date Published:April 06, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Extend/Shorten Time]
    Date Published:March 26, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Writ of Mandamus]
    Date Published:February 05, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Ex Parte Motion]
    Date Published:January 30, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion/Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:September 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Screening Order]
    Date Published:September 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.nvd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?133428
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 1 =