open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Nevada

NEVADA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Nevada
    Case Number:20-13895-nmc
    Party Name:ANTHONY EDWARD BLACK
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: FOX, TROY S. [Statement Adjourning Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:September 11, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: FOX, TROY S. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - pdf]
    Date Published:August 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: FOX, TROY S. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:August 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: FOX, TROY S. [Order Re: Debtor's Compliance with 521 (BNC)]
    Date Published:August 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: FOX, TROY S. [Auto-docket of online payment]
    Date Published:August 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: FOX, TROY S. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filing (ADI)]
    Date Published:August 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: FOX, TROY S. [Request for Special Notice (BK)]
    Date Published:August 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: FOX, TROY S. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset Individual (BNC-auto assignment)]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: FOX, TROY S. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: FOX, TROY S. [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: FOX, TROY S. [Statement of Social Security Number(s) (Must be Docketed Separately)]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Statement of Social Security Number(s) (Must be Docketed Separately)]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: FOX, TROY S. [Voluntary Petition 7]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition 7]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.nvb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?392960
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 1 =