Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Jersey

  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Jersey
    Case Number:2:17-cv-03196
    Party Name:OPEN TEXT CORPORATION v. HAKIMI et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order of Dismissal]
    Date Published:February 20, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation of Dismissal]
    Date Published:February 14, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation and Order]
    Date Published:August 08, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply to Response to Motion]
    Date Published:June 15, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum in Opposition of Motion]
    Date Published:June 12, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Pro Hac Vice counsel added]
    Date Published:May 19, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Pro Hac Vice to Receive NEF]
    Date Published:May 18, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:May 16, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:May 16, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Letter]
    Date Published:May 15, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:May 15, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Returned Executed]
    Date Published:May 11, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
    Date Published:May 11, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Exhibit (to Document)]
    Date Published:May 10, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order to Show Cause]
    Date Published:May 09, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Telephone Conference]
    Date Published:May 09, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:May 09, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
    Date Published:May 08, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:May 08, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
    Date Published:May 08, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Temporary Restraining Order]
    Date Published:May 08, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:May 06, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
    Date Published:May 06, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
    Date Published:May 05, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:May 05, 2017
  • Source: https://ecf.njd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?348436
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 3 =