open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico
    Case Number:2:10-cr-02610-1
    Party Name:USA v. Godlewski
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Modify Conditions of Release]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order]
    Date Published:July 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
    Date Published:July 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
    Date Published:June 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:June 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:June 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Response in Opposition]
    Date Published:June 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Reconsideration]
    Date Published:June 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order of Detention Pending Revocation Hearing]
    Date Published:May 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:May 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Oral Order]
    Date Published:May 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Hearing]
    Date Published:May 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Attorney Substitution]
    Date Published:May 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
    Date Published:April 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Appointing Public Defender]
    Date Published:March 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judge Reassignment (Text Only)]
    Date Published:February 06, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.nmd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?216831
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 3 =