open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of New Mexico

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of New Mexico
    Case Number:19-10868-t13
    Party Name:Diana Lynne Shubert
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [Hearing (Notice)]
    Date Published:July 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [Rescheduling Hearing (Order)]
    Date Published:June 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [Objection]
    Date Published:June 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [Deadline to File Objections (Notice - with Forms)]
    Date Published:June 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [Dismiss Case (Trustee/UST Motion)]
    Date Published:June 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [Statement Adjourning Meeting of Creditors - (text entry only)]
    Date Published:June 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [Deadline to File Objections (Notice)]
    Date Published:May 31, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [Change Date of Plan Payments (Motion)]
    Date Published:May 31, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
    Date Published:May 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [Entry of Appearance (Notice)]
    Date Published:May 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [Certification of Completion of Financial Management Course (eFinCert)]
    Date Published:May 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:April 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
    Date Published:April 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [Set Judge Code Flag]
    Date Published:April 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [Deadline to File Objs to Confirmation of Chapter 13 Plan (Notice)]
    Date Published:April 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [ Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:April 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [Meeting of Creditors 13]
    Date Published:April 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [Signature Page]
    Date Published:April 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [Certification/Statement Regarding Marital Status]
    Date Published:April 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [Disclosure of Compensation]
    Date Published:April 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [Statement of Social Security Number]
    Date Published:April 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [Credit Counseling Received: Certificates Submitted]
    Date Published:April 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [none]
    Date Published:April 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
    Date Published:April 15, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.nmb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?165119
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 1 =