open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of New Mexico

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of New Mexico
    Case Number:19-10870-j13
    Party Name:Sylvia M Saenz
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
    Date Published:July 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:June 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [Final Report and Account (Ch 13)]
    Date Published:June 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [Clerk's Notice of Fees Due]
    Date Published:May 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [Dismissal of Bankruptcy Proceeding (Notice)]
    Date Published:May 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [Trustee's Motion to Dismiss Case (Order)]
    Date Published:May 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [Intent to Dismiss Case for Failure to File Req Docs (Notice)]
    Date Published:May 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [Deadline to File Objections (Notice - with Forms)]
    Date Published:May 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [Dismiss Case (Trustee/UST Motion)]
    Date Published:May 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [Statement Adjourning Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:April 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [Terminate Deadline]
    Date Published:April 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [Pay Filing Fees in Installments (Order on Application)]
    Date Published:April 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:April 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
    Date Published:April 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [Request for Notice]
    Date Published:April 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [Set Judge Code Flag]
    Date Published:April 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [Credit Counseling Received: No Certificates]
    Date Published:April 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [Pay Filing Fee in Installments (Application)]
    Date Published:April 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [Statement of Social Security Number]
    Date Published:April 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [Deficient Filing (Notice)]
    Date Published:April 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [Meeting of Creditors 13]
    Date Published:April 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [Set Case Flag to Pro Se]
    Date Published:April 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
    Date Published:April 15, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.nmb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?165121
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 3 =