open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of New Mexico

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of New Mexico
    Case Number:19-11398-t13
    Party Name:Brent R. Aguilar and Cheri E. Aguilar
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [Minutes of Hearing - CHAP (text-only)]
    Date Published:August 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [Resulting from Preliminary Confirmation Hearing - with form (Order)]
    Date Published:August 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan (Trustee's)]
    Date Published:July 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [341 Chapter 13 - Concluded]
    Date Published:July 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [Certification of Completion of Financial Management Course (eFinCert)]
    Date Published:July 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:June 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
    Date Published:June 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
    Date Published:June 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [Request for Notice]
    Date Published:June 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [Set Judge Code Flag]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [Deadline to File Objections (Notice)]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [Affidavit/Declaration]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [Deadline to File Objs to Confirmation of Chapter 13 Plan (Notice)]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [none]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [Meeting of Creditors 13]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [Credit Counseling Received: Certificates Submitted]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [Statement of Social Security Number]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [Disclosure of Compensation]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [Signature Page]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [Valuation (BIF) (Motion)]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [ Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.nmb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?165654
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 1 =