open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of New Mexico

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of New Mexico
    Case Number:19-11401-t7
    Party Name:Melissa R. Maez
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gonzales, Yvette J. [Final Decree (Auto)]
    Date Published:September 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gonzales, Yvette J. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
    Date Published:September 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gonzales, Yvette J. [Discharging Debtor (Order) autodisc]
    Date Published:September 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gonzales, Yvette J. [Certification of Completion of Financial Management Course (eFinCert)]
    Date Published:August 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gonzales, Yvette J. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - no funds (341 filings)]
    Date Published:July 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gonzales, Yvette J. [Disclosure of Compensation]
    Date Published:July 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gonzales, Yvette J. [Update 28 USC Section 589b stats]
    Date Published:July 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gonzales, Yvette J. [Chapter 7 Statement of Monthly Income 122A-1 / Exemption Presumption of Abuse 122A-1Supp]
    Date Published:July 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gonzales, Yvette J. [Schedules, Summaries & Statement of Financial Affairs]
    Date Published:July 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gonzales, Yvette J. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:June 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gonzales, Yvette J. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
    Date Published:June 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gonzales, Yvette J. [Deficient Filing (Notice)]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gonzales, Yvette J. [Set Deficiency Deadlines]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gonzales, Yvette J. [Terminate Deadline]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gonzales, Yvette J. [Set Judge Code Flag]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gonzales, Yvette J. [Certification/Statement Regarding Marital Status]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gonzales, Yvette J. [none]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gonzales, Yvette J. [Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gonzales, Yvette J. [Statement of Social Security Number]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gonzales, Yvette J. [Statement of Intention]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gonzales, Yvette J. [Signature Page]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gonzales, Yvette J. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (FEE)]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gonzales, Yvette J. [Credit Counseling Received: Certificates Submitted]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.nmb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?165657
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 2 =