open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of New Mexico

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of New Mexico
    Case Number:19-11622-j7
    Party Name:Florus Hendrik Van Arkel
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gonzales, Yvette J. [Final Decree (Auto)]
    Date Published:October 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gonzales, Yvette J. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
    Date Published:October 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gonzales, Yvette J. [Discharging Debtor (Order) autodisc]
    Date Published:October 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gonzales, Yvette J. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - no funds (341 filings)]
    Date Published:September 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gonzales, Yvette J. [Statement of Financial Affairs]
    Date Published:August 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gonzales, Yvette J. [Amended Voluntary Petition]
    Date Published:August 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gonzales, Yvette J. [Statement Adjourning Meeting of Creditors (341 filings)]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gonzales, Yvette J. [Certification of Completion of Financial Management Course]
    Date Published:August 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gonzales, Yvette J. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:July 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gonzales, Yvette J. [Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic]
    Date Published:July 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gonzales, Yvette J. [Set Judge Code Flag]
    Date Published:July 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gonzales, Yvette J. [Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
    Date Published:July 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gonzales, Yvette J. [Credit Counseling Received: Certificates Submitted]
    Date Published:July 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gonzales, Yvette J. [Certification/Statement Regarding Marital Status]
    Date Published:July 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gonzales, Yvette J. [Statement of Social Security Number]
    Date Published:July 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gonzales, Yvette J. [Set Case Flag to Pro Se]
    Date Published:July 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gonzales, Yvette J. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:July 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.nmb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?165888
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 1 =