open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of New Mexico

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of New Mexico
    Case Number:19-11621-t13
    Party Name:Frank Chavez, Jr.
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [Resulting from Preliminary Confirmation Hearing - with form (Order)]
    Date Published:September 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [Minutes of Hearing - CHAP (text-only)]
    Date Published:September 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan (Trustee's)]
    Date Published:August 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [341 Chapter 13 - Concluded]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
    Date Published:August 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [Terminate Deadline]
    Date Published:August 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [Update 28 USC Section 589b stats]
    Date Published:August 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [Chapter 13 Statement of Monthly Income 122C-1]
    Date Published:August 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [Schedules, Summaries & Statement of Financial Affairs]
    Date Published:August 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [Hearing (Notice)]
    Date Published:August 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [Deadline to File Objs to Confirmation of Chapter 13 Plan (Notice)]
    Date Published:August 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [Assume Lease or Executory Contract (Motion)]
    Date Published:August 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [ Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:August 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [Additional Parties of Bankruptcy Case Filing (Notice)]
    Date Published:August 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [Amended Mailing List]
    Date Published:August 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [Entry of Appearance (Notice)]
    Date Published:August 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [Certification of Completion of Financial Management Course (eFinCert)]
    Date Published:August 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [Update Deficiency Deadlines]
    Date Published:July 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [Extend/Shorten Time (Order)]
    Date Published:July 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [Response]
    Date Published:July 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [Extend/ShortenTime (Motion)]
    Date Published:July 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:July 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
    Date Published:July 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [none]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [Certification/Statement Regarding Marital Status]
    Date Published:July 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [Deficient Filing (Notice)]
    Date Published:July 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [Set Judge Code Flag]
    Date Published:July 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [Meeting of Creditors 13]
    Date Published:July 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [Disclosure of Compensation]
    Date Published:July 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [Signature Page]
    Date Published:July 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
    Date Published:July 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [Credit Counseling Received: Certificates Submitted]
    Date Published:July 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [Statement of Social Security Number]
    Date Published:July 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.nmb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?165887
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 3 =