open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico
    Case Number:1:19-cr-01819-1
    Party Name:USA v. Dye
  • Filing Type:Criminal [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
    Date Published:September 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Response (when not to a motion)]
    Date Published:August 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Response to Motion]
    Date Published:August 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:August 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Bill of Particulars]
    Date Published:August 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Strike]
    Date Published:August 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Hearing]
    Date Published:July 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
    Date Published:July 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Discovery Order]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
    Date Published:July 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Oral Order]
    Date Published:July 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:July 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.nmd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?422548
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 2 =